Frank v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Leslie E Kobayashi |
Referred: | Kenneth J Mansfield |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00180 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 11:09 AM HST |
Defendant
Does 1-5
|
|
Defendant
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Leah Frank
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 05/03 10:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leah Frank. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company served on 4/29/2024. (Ferrer, Eric) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
Link
Fri 04/26 10:50 AM
EO: The Court has carefully reviewed the10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to R. Martin Weber, Jr. ("Motion"). In the Declaration of R. Martin Weber, Jr. attached to the Motion, Mr. Weber attests that he has "filed a pro hac application for Los Angeles Superior Court. The judge pointed out some deficiencies in [Mr. Weber's] application, and denied the application without prejudice to refiling. [Mr. Weber] corrected the deficiencies, refiled the application, and it is set for hearing on May 6, 2024." ECF No.10 at 2. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file an amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to R. Martin Weber, Jr. indicating the Los Angeles Superior Court's ruling on Mr. Weber's amended pro hac vice application. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(kjm3) |
|
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 10:37 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO BRIANNA J. STRANGE, ESQ. re9 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 4/26/2024. (eta) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 10:33 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO BRIAN R. STRANGE, ESQ. re8 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 4/26/2024. (eta) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/25 12:37 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of R. Martin Weber, Jr. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2993955.Eric G. Ferrer, I appearing for Plaintiff Leah Frank (Ferrer, Eric) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/25 12:34 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Brianna Strange Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2993946.Eric G. Ferrer, I appearing for Plaintiff Leah Frank (Ferrer, Eric) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/25 12:30 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Brian Strange Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2993923.Eric G. Ferrer, I appearing for Plaintiff Leah Frank (Ferrer, Eric) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 8:14 AM
Summons Issued as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (jni) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 8:09 AM
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (jni) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Civil Waiver of Service Packet
Fri 04/19 8:08 AM
CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (jni) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Waiver of the Service of Summons | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Rule 16
Fri 04/19 8:06 AM
Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 6/17/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/19/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 04/19 7:59 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00180 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings . (jni) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons (Proposed)
Fri 04/19 7:19 AM
Summons (Proposed) (Ferrer, Eric) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 7:17 AM
COMPLAINT ; Jury Trial Demanded against Does 1-5, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-2990698.), filed by Leah Frank.(Ferrer, Eric) Modified on 4/19/2024 (jni) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Insurance Declarations and Endorsements Page, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Rental Condominium Unitowners Policy, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |