United States of America v. Doe
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Leslie E Kobayashi |
Referred: | Wes Reber Porter |
Case #: | 1:24-mc-00244 |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/09/2024 11:59 PM HST |
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Redacted Document
Tue 05/07 9:10 AM
REDACTED NOTICE OF APPEAL (filed 7/11/2022) - by John Doe. (eta) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Redacted Document
Tue 05/07 9:08 AM
REDACTED JUDGMENT IN A CRIMINAL CASE (filed 7/1/2022) . (eta) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Redacted Document
Tue 05/07 9:06 AM
REDACTED MINUTES (filed 6/29/2022) . (eta) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Redacted Document
Tue 05/07 9:03 AM
REDACTED Government's Amended Filing of DECLARATION OF REED MAHUNA; EXHIBITS "A" & "B"; Certificate of Service (filed on 10/15/2020) - by United States of America. (eta) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Redacted Document
Tue 05/07 9:00 AM
REDACTED Government's Filing of DECLARATION of Reed Mahuna; Exhibits "A" & "B" ; Certificate of Service (filed 10/13/2020) - by United States of America. (eta) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Redacted Document
Tue 05/07 8:57 AM
REDACTED FOURTH STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND EXCLUDING TIME UNDER THE SPEEDY TRIAL ACT (filed 4/8/2020) - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 4/8/2020. (eta) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Redacted Document
Tue 05/07 8:53 AM
REDACTED THIRD STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND EXCLUDING TIME UNDER THE SPEEDY TRIAL ACT (filed 10/21/2019) - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 10/21/2019.. (eta) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Redacted Document
Tue 05/07 8:49 AM
REDACTED Government's DECLARATION of Counsel Regarding Status Conference Set for 4/1/2019; Exhibit (1); Certificate of Service (filed 4/1/2019) - by United States of America. (eta) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Redacted Document
Tue 05/07 8:45 AM
REDACTED Government's REQUEST for Discovery Pursuant to Rules 12.3 and 16(b)(1); Certificate of Service (filed 3/13/20219) - by United States of America. (eta) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Redacted Document
Tue 05/07 8:41 AM
REDACTED Defendant No. 01 John Doe Notice and First Supplemental Request for Discovery (filed 10/12/2018) - by John Doe. (eta) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Redacted Document
Tue 05/07 8:36 AM
REDACTED INDICTMENT (filed 6/20/2018) - by United States of America. (eta) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
order
Sealed Order
Fri 04/26 7:32 AM
SEALED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR SEALED RELIEF as to John Doe (filed 4/4/2024) - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 4/4/2024. (eta) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Sealed Document
Fri 04/26 7:30 AM
SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re SEALED MOTION; Certificate of Service (filed 3/20/2024) - filed by John Doe (eta) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Sealed Document
Fri 04/26 7:28 AM
SEALED MOTION ; Declaration in Support of Motion; Certificate of Service (filed 1/29/2024) - filed by John Doe (eta) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Sealed Document
Fri 04/26 7:25 AM
SEALED STATEMENT OF REASONS as to John Doe (filed 7/1/2022) (eta) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Sealed Document
Fri 04/26 7:23 AM
SEALED MOTION; Certificate of Service (filed 6/28/2022) - filed by United States of America (eta) Modified on 4/26/2024 (eta) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Sealed Document
Fri 04/26 7:08 AM
SEALED SENTENCING STATEMENT and SEALED MOTION (filed 6/22/2022) - filed by John Doe(eta) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Q, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit R, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit S, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit T, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit U, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit V, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit W, | ||
Att: 24 Certificate of Service | ||
14 | 14
misc
Sealed Document
Fri 04/26 6:47 AM
SEALED PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT (1); Notice to Attorneys (filed 3/3/2022) (eta) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Sealed Document
Fri 04/26 6:44 AM
SEALED SENTENCING STATEMENT; Certificate of Service (filed 11/15/2021) - by United States of America (eta) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Sealed Document
Fri 04/26 6:42 AM
SEALED SENTENCING STATEMENT; Certificate of Service (filed 11/5/2021) - by John Doe (eta) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Sealed Document
Fri 04/26 6:40 AM
SEALED DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT (1); Notice to Attorneys as to John Doe (filed 10/21/2021) . (eta) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Sealed Document
Fri 04/26 6:36 AM
SEALED RESPONSE to Order Granting Ex Parte Motion No. 4; Exhibit "A" (filed 2/25/2019) - filed by John Doe (eta) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Sealed Order
Tue 04/23 9:21 AM
SEALED ORDER re8 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 4/23/2024. (eta) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Sealed Document
Tue 04/23 9:19 AM
SEALED REQUEST for Clarification - filed by John Doe. (eta) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Sealed Document
Fri 04/19 11:42 AM
SEALED Ex Parte MOTION No. 4; Declaration of Counsel; ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION NO. 4 as to John Doe (filed 2/8/2019) - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 2/8/2019. (eta) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Sealed Document
Fri 04/19 11:39 AM
SEALED Ex Parte MOTION No. 3; Declaration of Counsel; ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION NO. 3 as to John Doe (filed 1/23/2019) - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 1/23/2019. (eta) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Sealed Document
Fri 04/19 11:30 AM
SEALED ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION NO. 1 as to John Doe (filed 12/6/2018) - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/5/2018 (eta) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Sealed Document
Fri 04/19 11:26 AM
SEALED Ex Parte MOTION No. 1; Declaration of Counsel; Proposed Order (filed 12/5/2018) - filed by John Doe. (eta) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/19 11:23 AM
NOTICE and First Supplemental REQUEST for Discovery; (Certificate of Service attached) (filed 10/12/2018) - by John Doe. (eta) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/19 11:15 AM
INDICTMENT (filed 6/20/2018) - by United States of America. (eta) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 04/19 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect miscellaneous case number MC 24-00244 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings (this case is opened for administrative purposes only). (eta) |