Lia v. Walmart, Inc.
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mae A D'Agostino |
Referred: | Miroslav Lovric |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00543 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 5:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Lia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Jury Demand
Wed 04/24 11:13 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Walmart, Inc.. (Cavanagh, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/24 11:07 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal, (Cavanagh, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 04/23 12:19 PM
TEXT NOTICE: The initial Conference set for 5/31/2024 at 12:00PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, will be held via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. The Courtroom Deputy will send a teams link to the parties to participate. (jdc ) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice Regarding Judge D'Agostino Case Disposition Pilot (Text-Only)
Fri 04/19 3:51 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf . (sbb) |
|
4 | 4
misc
G.O. 25 Filing Order
Fri 04/19 3:50 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 5/31/2024 at 12:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/24/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sbb) |
|
3 | 3
respoth
Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal
Fri 04/19 3:40 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Walmart, Inc.. (sbb) |
|
2 | 2
misc
State Court Complaint
Fri 04/19 3:29 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff(s) in Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Albany. (sbb) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/19 3:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Albany, case number 900607-23 (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6702787) filed by Walmart, Inc..(sbb) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit State- Court Complaint and Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit- Response to Supplemental Demand, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit- Letter to Clerk of Enclosed Documents, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |