Colorado District Court
Judge:Charlotte N Sweeney
Referred: Kathryn A Starnella
Case #: 1:24-cv-01076
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 16, 2024 2:23 AM MDT
Defendant
TTEC Services Corporation
Represented By
Arthur J. Rooney, III
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Daniel Albert Nicholas Graham
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Derek Wilfong
Represented By
Matthew Steven Grimsley
Lazzaro Law Firm LLC
contact info

GPO Sep 11 2024
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney: Oral Argument Hearing held via VTC on 9/11/2024. 13 Defendant TTEC Services Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue is DENIED. Court Reporter: Sarah Mitchell. (jdyne)
GPO Feb 21 2025
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Opt-In Discovery, and Court-Authorized Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 2/21/25.(jdyne)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
59 59 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/30 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by Plaintiff Derek Wilfong(Grimsley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Forms
58 58 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/30 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by Plaintiff Derek Wilfong(Grimsley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Forms
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
57 57 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by Plaintiff Derek Wilfong(Grimsley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Forms
56 56 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by Plaintiff Derek Wilfong(Grimsley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Forms
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
55 55 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/23 1:39 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by Plaintiff Derek Wilfong(Grimsley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Forms
54 54 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/23 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by Plaintiff Derek Wilfong(Grimsley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Forms