California Central District Court
Judge:James V Selna
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 5:24-cv-00836
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2024
Terminated:Jun 26, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 16, 2024 1:27 AM PDT
Defendant
Miguel Solorio
Represented By
Brian P Kinder
The Kinder Law Group
contact info
Gordon Andrew Petersen, II
Law Office Of Drew Petersen, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Careco, LLC
Represented By
Caroline H. Mankey
Akerman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
35 35 misc Receipt Mon 07/22 3:30 PM
Receipt of Acknowledgment of Remand (G-17) received 7/1/2024 from Riverside County Superior Court. (es)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
34 34 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Thu 06/27 10:15 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (twdb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ORDER
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
33 33 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Thu 06/27 10:11 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Riverside County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Riverside County Superior Court. (twdb)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Dismiss Case Remand Case to State Court Disqualify Counsel Thu 06/27 10:07 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge James V. Selna: Order Regarding Motions to Dismiss, Remand, and Disqualify Counsel (15 ,19 ,21 ). For the following reasons, the Court GRANTS CareCo's Motion to Remand and DENIES as moot Solorio's Motions to Dismiss and Disqualify. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (twdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
31 31 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 06/20 10:58 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: On its own motion, the Court hereby VACATES the hearings on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Attorney Fees and Defendant Miguel Solorio's Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel and Law Firm [Dkt. Nos. 15, 19 and 21] set for Monday, June 24, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. The Court takes the motions under submission and will inform the parties if a hearing is necessary and schedule it for a future date. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo)
Related: [-]
30 30 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 06/20 10:45 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: On its own motion, the Court hereby VACATES the hearings [Dkt. Nos. 15, 19 and 21] set for Monday, June 24, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. The Court takes the motions under submission and will inform the parties if a hearing is necessary and schedule it for a future date. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
29 29 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 06/10 8:49 PM
REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Caroline Mankey and Ackerman LLP 21 filed by Defendant Miguel Solorio. (Petersen, Gordon)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 06/10 11:58 AM
REPLY in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside County Superior Court19 filed by Plaintiff Careco, LLC. (Mankey, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
27 27 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Thu 06/06 12:05 PM
ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (eva)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings Thu 06/06 11:55 AM
MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER RE SCHEDULING DATES by Judge James V. Selna. The Court has read and considered the parties Rule 26(f) Report and sets the following dates: Jury Trial August 19, 2025 at 8:30 a.m. Final PreTrial Conference August 4, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. File PreTrial Documents not later than July 28, 2025. File motions in limine not later than July 7, 2025. Discovery Cut-off May 16, 2025. Expert Discovery Cut-off May 16, 2025. Initial disclosure of Experts not later than March 14, 2025. Rebuttal disclosure of Experts not later than April 18, 2025. Law and Motion Cut-off June 30, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. Motions to be filed and served not later than June 2, 2025. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) Modified on 6/6/2024 (rolm)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
25 25 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 06/03 9:34 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Defendant Miguel Solorio.. (Petersen, Gordon)
Related: [-]
24 24 19 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 06/03 5:32 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside County Superior Court19 filed by Defendant Miguel Solorio. (Kinder, Brian)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 06/03 2:26 PM
OPPOSITION to Defendant's Motion To Disqualify Counsel re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Caroline Mankey and Ackerman LLP 21 filed by Plaintiff Careco, LLC.(Mankey, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Caroline H. Mankey,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jeff Martin,
Att: 3 Declaration of Paul Stromberg
Friday, May 31, 2024
22 22 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 05/31 9:49 AM
[IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss15 is CONTINUED from Monday, June 10, 2024, at 1:30 p.m. to Monday, June 24, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (eva)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
21 21 motion Disqualify Counsel Fri 05/24 11:37 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Caroline Mankey and Ackerman LLP filed by Defendant Miguel Solorio. Motion set for hearing on 6/24/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Petersen, Gordon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kinder in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration of Solorio in Support
20 20 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 05/24 4:59 PM
REPLY Reply in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6) 15 filed by Defendant Miguel Solorio. (Petersen, Gordon)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
19 19 motion Remand Case to State Court Mon 05/20 3:22 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Careco, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/24/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Mankey, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Caroline H. Mankey,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
18 18 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 05/20 3:15 PM
Opposition to Motion To Dismiss Complaint Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6) 15 filed by Plaintiff Careco, LLC. (Mankey, Caroline)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 05/20 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Careco, LLC, (Mankey, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
16 16 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 04/29 9:53 AM
Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 06/10/2024 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 06/03/2024. (eva)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
15 15 motion Dismiss Case Fri 04/26 4:29 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Miguel Solorio. Motion set for hearing on 6/10/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Petersen, Gordon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
14 14 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 04/24 2:44 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (eva)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Transferring Reference/Discovery purs LR 83-1.3.1 (Related Case)(CV-34a) Wed 04/24 2:42 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:24-cv-00663-JVS-(JDEx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for for Discovery. The case number will now read as follows: 5:24-cv-00836-JVS-(JDEx). Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (dve)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
12 12 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 04/23 8:24 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
11 11 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 04/23 8:24 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
10 10 transfer Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form Tue 04/23 8:23 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow for discovery. Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge James V. Selna. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:24-cv-00836 JVS (DTBx). (car)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
9 9 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 04/22 11:48 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Association of Counsel6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Notice of Association of Counsel not signed Kinder Law Group APC. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
8 8 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 04/19 6:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Miguel Solorio, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120)7 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Notice of Related Case(s)4 served on 04/19/2024. (Kinder, Brian)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Fri 04/19 5:14 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Miguel Solorio. (Kinder, Brian)
Related: [-]
6 6 attorney Association of Counsel Fri 04/19 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Gordon Andrew Petersen, II on behalf of Defendant Miguel Solorio. Filed by Defendant Miguel Solorio (Petersen, Gordon)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 04/19 5:08 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gordon Andrew Petersen, II counsel for Defendant Miguel Solorio. Adding Gordon Andrew Petersen, II as counsel of record for Miguel Solorio for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Miguel Solorio. (Attorney Gordon Andrew Petersen, II added to party Miguel Solorio(pty:dft))(Petersen, Gordon)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Related Case(s) Fri 04/19 5:00 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Miguel Solorio. Related Case(s): 8:24-cv-00663-JVS-JDE (Kinder, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/19 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Miguel Solorio, (Kinder, Brian)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 04/19 4:55 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Miguel Solorio. (Kinder, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/19 4:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number CVRI2401345 Receipt No: ACACDC-37320533 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Miguel Solorio. (Attorney Brian P Kinder added to party Miguel Solorio(pty:dft))(Kinder, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit Certificate of Counsel,
Att: 5 Exhibit Complaint
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 04/23 8:26 AM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, Miguel Solorio. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Careco, LLC, Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]