DREVER ATELIER ANGEL BORROWER, LLC v. S. MCCOY GROUP LLC et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Phillips |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-03113 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Taney County Civil Court, 2446-CC00064 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 6:08 PM CDT |
Defendant
MIDWEST GC LLC
|
|
Defendant
S. MCCOY GROUP LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DREVER ATELIER ANGEL BORROWER, LLC
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 05/01 1:02 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) |
||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Rule 16 Notice
Thu 04/25 12:13 PM
ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/11/2024. Rule 26 conference due by 5/28/2024. Signed on 4/25/24 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 04/25 12:11 PM
ORDER granting10 Defendants S. McCoy Group, LLC and Midwest GC, LLCs Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise plead to the Petition for Damages is GRANTED, up to and including May 9, 2024. Signed on 4/25/24 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/24 3:32 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Stephen M. Murphy on behalf of Midwest GC, LLC (Attorney Stephen M. Murphy added to party Midwest GC, LLC(pty:dft))(Murphy, Stephen) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 04/24 3:29 PM
Consent MOTION for extension of time Agreed Motion for Extension of Time filed by Michael Quinn Murphy on behalf of Midwest GC, LLC, S. McCoy Group LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/8/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Murphy, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/24 3:26 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Michael Quinn Murphy on behalf of Midwest GC, LLC (Attorney Michael Quinn Murphy added to party Midwest GC, LLC(pty:dft))(Murphy, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/23 1:43 PM
ORDER granting7 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Phillip Wang for Drever Atelier Angel Borrower, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/23 12:21 PM
Motion to allow Phillip Wang to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8974511) filed by Steven Martin Aaron on behalf of Drever Atelier Angel Borrower, LLC. (Aaron, Steven) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/23 12:15 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Steven Martin Aaron on behalf of Drever Atelier Angel Borrower, LLC (Aaron, Steven) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/22 1:25 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Stephen M. Murphy on behalf of S. McCoy Group LLC (Attorney Stephen M. Murphy added to party S. McCoy Group LLC(pty:dft))(Murphy, Stephen) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Filing
Mon 04/22 9:37 AM
NOTICE of filing Notice to State Court of Filing of Notice of Removal by S. McCoy Group LLC re1 Notice of Removal, (Murphy, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of MAPN
Mon 04/22 8:37 AM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Furtak, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
Saturday, April 20, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing
Sat 04/20 5:23 AM
NOTICE of filing Notice to Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Removal by S. MCCOY GROUP LLC re1 Notice of Removal, (Murphy, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/19 4:53 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of TANEY County, case number 2446-CC00064, filed by Michael Quinn Murphy. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-8970739.(Murphy, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet EXHIBIT 5 |