Aficial v. Cuadrado et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Linda Lopez |
Referred: | Allison H Goddard |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00711 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 39:0409 Suits by and against the Postal Service |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 30, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 5:09 PM PDT |
Defendant
Edwin Cuadrado
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1 through 25
|
|
Defendant
Linda Hasten
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steve Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The United States Postal Service
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Aficial
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 04/30 11:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and due to the Plaintiff filing a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, this case is dismissed without prejudice. See ECF No.3 .(no document attached) (ddf) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 04/30 9:21 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Benjamin Aficial (Webb, Lenden) (ddf) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 3:22 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 3:18 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Edwin Cuadrado, Does 1 through 25, Linda Hasten, Steve Murphy, The United States Postal Service ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18776494.), filed by Benjamin Aficial. The new case number is 3:24-cv-711-LL-AHG. Judge Linda Lopez and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Webb, Lenden)(ggv) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |