McGarity v. Sun-Maid Growers of California et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cynthia Bashant |
Referred: | Daniel E Butcher |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00714 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332pl Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, 37-02024-00012618-CU-FR-CTL |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 5:09 PM PDT |
Defendant
Does 1 through 10
|
|
Defendant
Sun-Maid Growers of California
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margaret McGarity
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk
Fri 05/03 9:25 AM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Christopher M. Murphy appearing for Defendant Sun-Maid Growers of California (no document attached) (exs) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/02 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Timothy Spaid on behalf of Sun-Maid Growers of California (Spaid, Jacob)Attorney Jacob Timothy Spaid added to party Sun-Maid Growers of California(pty:dft) (mjw) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 04/25 4:14 PM
Order Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No.7 ). Defendant shall file its motion to dismiss on or before 05/10/2024. Opposition to the motion to dismiss due by 6/10/2024. Reply due by 7/1/2024. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 04/25/2024. (mjw) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File
Thu 04/25 1:39 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss by Sun-Maid Growers of California. (Aronsohn, Daniel) (mjw) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order re Pro Hac Vice Application
Wed 04/24 11:40 AM
ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Christopher M. Murphy, re4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/24/2024.(exs) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 05/03 9:17 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Murphy, Christopher) (exs) |
|
5 | 5
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 04/23 7:59 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sun-Maid Growers of California re1 Notice of Removal,2 Notice of Party With Financial Interest,3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Aronsohn, Daniel) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/23 7:54 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-18786406.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Murphy, Christopher) (exs) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 3:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sun-Maid Growers of California. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (axi) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Fri 04/19 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Sun-Maid Growers of California. Identifying Other Affiliate Sun-Land Products of California for Sun-Maid Growers of California. (axi) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/19 3:47 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18776465.), filed by Sun-Maid Growers of California. The new case number is 3:24-cv-714-BAS-DEB. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(axi) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of David Dewall |