Bartels v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew D Hallman |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00679 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:0405g Review of Commissioner's Final Decision |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 24 minutes ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Attorney Appearance
Fri 04/26 4:37 PM
Notice of Appearance of Christopher Vieira appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration . Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Vieira, Christopher) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Attorney Appearance
Mon 04/22 8:51 AM
Notice of Appearance of Kevin C. Danielson appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration . Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Danielson, Kevin) |
|
order
Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT
Mon 04/22 8:17 AM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 2 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrew D. Hallman. (dsg) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
oth_evt
Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT
Fri 04/19 4:50 PM
Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrew D. Hallman. (gd) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP
Fri 04/19 4:23 PM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Bridget Bartels. (Linerud, Rory) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Social Security
Fri 04/19 4:19 PM
Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected) . Plaintiff consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Filed by Bridget Bartels against Commissioner Social Security Administration Social Security Answer is due by 8/19/2024.. (Linerud, Rory) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
oth_evt
Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/19 4:52 PM
Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Standing Order 06-mc-9130, the United States consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (gd) |