Nevada District Court
Judge:Anne R Traum
Referred: Craig S Denney
Case #: 3:24-cv-00178
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 16, 2024 1:53 AM PDT
Defendant
Everi Holdings Inc.
Represented By
Michael N Feder
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
John Patrick Desmond
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Gabriel A. Blumberg
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Stephen C. Whittaker
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Rachel Susan Brass
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Samuel Grant Liversidge
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Everi Payments Inc.
Represented By
Michael N Feder
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
John Patrick Desmond
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Gabriel A. Blumberg
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Stephen C. Whittaker
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Rachel Susan Brass
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Samuel Grant Liversidge
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Koin Mobile, LLC
Represented By
Robert C. Ryan
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Nicholas W. Katz
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Paul Douglas Swanson
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Paul D. Swanson
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Joshua Michael Halen
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Timothy A. Lukas
Holland & Hart, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
52 52 minord Minute Order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 02/18 5:12 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 2/18/2025. In light of the Court's approval of the parties' joint stipulation to stay the case (ECF No. 51), the Court orders Defendant's Motion to Dismiss denied without prejudice. The motion may be refiled if the stay is lifted. ORDER denying31 Motion to Dismiss; (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NVT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
51 51 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 02/13 4:51 PM
ORDER granting50 STIPULATION TO STAY CASE Pending Settlement Discussions. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 2/13/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
50 50 motion Stipulation Thu 02/13 12:37 PM
STIPULATION TO STAY CASE Pending Settlement Discussions by Plaintiff Koin Mobile, LLC. (Halen, Joshua) (stay) (dispositive)
Related: [-]