Smith et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah E Geraghty |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01648 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 12:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Smith
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
30+
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/19 2:32 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 4/19/2024. (sap) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 8:51 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent General Insurance Company of America, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana. (pdt) |
|
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Fri 04/19 8:46 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana. Discovery ends on 9/16/2024. (pdt) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/19 8:44 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13371866) (pdt) |
|
Att: 1 Answer, | ||
Att: 2 Disclosure Statement, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |