NFG Asset Holdings, LL v. Commercial Private Equity, LLC
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas W Thrash, Jr |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01689 |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Cause | 09:09 Application for Confirmation of Arbitration Award |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 12:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
Commercial Private Equity, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NFG Asset Holdings, LL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Service
Thu 04/25 5:24 PM
MOTION for Service of Process by US Marshals by NFG Asset Holdings, LL.(Major, George) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order (Motion for Service of Process by US Marshals) | ||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 4:41 PM
COMPLAINT (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13376322) filed by NFG Asset Holdings, LL., #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Loan Commitment, | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit B-Arbitrator Final Award, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Letter Confirming Selection of Arbitrator |