Long View Strategies II, Corp. v. Selective Insurance Company of America
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard W Story |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00080 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court of Stephens County, SUCV2024000095 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 12:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
Selective Insurance Company of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Long View Strategies II, Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Filing
Mon 04/22 8:08 AM
COURT NOTICE OF FILING: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 3:27 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Selective Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for Selective Insurance Company of America. (Johnson, Robin) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Fri 04/19 2:54 PM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Selective Insurance Company of America. Discovery ends on 9/16/2024.(Burke, Kamber) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certified Policy | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/19 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kamber Stefany Burke on behalf of Selective Insurance Company of America (Burke, Kamber) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/19 2:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL, with COMPLAINT, filed by Selective Insurance Company of America. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13376178)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |