Loera v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William M Ray, II |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00109 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 12:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
Auto-Owners Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosalio Loera
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 04/30 1:37 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Time to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference by Rosalio Loera.(Bledsoe, Noah) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference | ||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 04/30 4:18 PM
ORDER: Having considered the foregoing Consent Motion to Extend Deadline to time for Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 26(f) conference and Join Preliminary Report, for good cause shown and all parties consenting hereto, it is hereby ordered that, the Parties shall have 15 days after this Court rules on the Motion to Withdrawal to conduct the Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/29/2024. (tmf) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 3:11 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Auto-Owners Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Owners Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Home-Owners Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Property-Owners Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Southern-Owners Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Auto-Owners Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Auto-Owners Life Insurance for Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Sizemore, Brittney) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/19 1:32 PM
NOTICE by Rosalio Loera Notice of Intent to Withdrawal as Counsel (Bledsoe, Noah) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Fri 04/19 1:12 PM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 9/16/2024.(tmf) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing
Fri 04/19 1:11 PM
NOTICE Of Intent to Withdraw as Counsel by Noah T. Bledsoe as to Rosalio Loera. (filed in Whitfield County Superior Court on 4/12/2024) (tmf) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/19 1:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13375601)(tmf) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Daniel Tonnis, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Fri 04/19 1:13 PM
Submission of2 NOTICE Of Intent to Withdraw as Counsel by Noah T. Bledsoe as to Rosalio Loera, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (tmf) |