Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | Colin H Lindsay |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00251 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Social Security Case Assignment
Wed 05/01 1:55 PM
Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 5/22/2024. (HMC) |
|
8 | 8
service
SSA Notice of Service
Wed 05/01 1:50 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE: Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and[LINK:General Order 2023-2:] , the Court hereby notifies the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration and the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of Kentucky that a Complaint seeking judicial review has been filed. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the official notification referenced in Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions. The plaintiff does not need to serve separately a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official Entry. No Document is attached. (HMC) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 05/01 1:49 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 04/30/2024 granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Johnson's application to proceed without prepayment of fees (DN3 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to file Johnson's Complaint. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and General Order No. 23-02, the Clerk is directed to transmit a Notice of Electronic Filing to the appropriate office within the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and to the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of Kentucky. Service need not be accomplished under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. cc: Counsel (HMC) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/01 1:45 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 04/30/2024 granting5 Motion for Clifford M. Farrell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(HMC) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/23 10:53 AM
MOTION for Clifford M. Farrell to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-4019226. by Plaintiff Sharon Johnson (Farrell, Clifford) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Deficiency
Mon 04/22 9:46 AM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Clifford M. Farrell re1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/6/2024. (KJA) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/19 5:43 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by Plaintiff Sharon Johnson. (KDY) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assignment
Fri 04/19 5:40 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. (KDY) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 5:38 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Sharon Johnson against Commissioner of Social Security. (KDY) |
|
Att: 1 Notice Regarding Substitution of Party Upon Death of Claimant, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet |