Tene et al v. United Ground Express, Inc.
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Prose |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01078 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1332lr Diversity - Labor |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 2:58 AM MDT |
Defendant
United Ground Express, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Klountcha
|
|
Plaintiff
Evens Tene
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Mon 04/29 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew H. Turner on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Andrew H. Turner added to party Christian Klountcha(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew H. Turner added to party Evens Tene(pty:pla) (Turner, Andrew) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/26 4:10 PM
ANSWER to4 Complaint by United Ground Express, Inc..(Gartenberg, David) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Mon 04/22 8:54 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Mon 04/22 8:54 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (blaws) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
misc
Order - State Court
Mon 04/22 8:52 AM
STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Defendant United Ground Express, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, by Jill Deborah Dorancy, District Court Judge, Denver County, on 04/05/2024. (blaws) |
|
5 | 5
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint
Mon 04/22 8:49 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Cover Sheet, Cover Letter upon United Ground Express, Inc. on 02/28/2024. (blaws) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/22 8:47 AM
STATE COURT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Unpaid Wages against United Ground Express, Inc., filed by Evens Tene, Christian Klountcha. (blaws) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases
Mon 04/22 8:43 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 6:52 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent United Airlines Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent United Airlines, Inc. for United Ground Express, Inc.. (Gartenberg, David) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/19 6:47 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Ground Express, Inc. from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2024CV30583. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9647310), filed by United Ground Express, Inc..(Gartenberg, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 16 Civil Cover Sheet |