USA v. Olivares-Hernandez
Arizona District Court | |
Case #: | 2:24-cr-00653 |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 12:50 AM MST |
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Gerson Olivares-Hernandez (1)
Terminated: 04/18/2024
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/20/2024 2:24 AM MST |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
Arrest of Gerson Olivares-Hernandez on 4/15/2024. (JMA) [2:24-mj-01628-JFM] | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf: Initial Appearance as to Gerson Olivares-Hernandez held on 4/17/2024. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. FPD, Robert Bruce Stirling is appointed for defendant. Arraignment held on 4/17/2024. Plea and Sentence Hearing held on 4/17/2024. Defendant (1) enters a plea of guilty and is sentenced as to Count 2 of the Information, Count 1 of the Information is dismissed. Special assessment is remitted. Interpreter required Spanish. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Joseph Nwoga (Duty) for the Government, AFPD Robert Bruce Stirling for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Patrick Brandlin assists defendant. Hearing held 1:46 PM to 1:55 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JMA) | |
5 | 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf.(JMA)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) | |
6 | 6
![]() |