Hawaii District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00022
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2024 4:48 PM HST
Defendant
Shawn Pauahi Santana (1)
Represented By
Matthew Dennis Mannisto
Law Office Of Matthew Mannisto
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Margaret C. Nammar
U.S. Attorney'S Office, District Of Hawaii
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/23/2024 4:48 PM HST
Friday, April 12, 2024
1 1 9 pgs SEALED CRIMINAL COMPLAINT; AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Shawn Pauahi Santana (1) - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 4/12/2024. (jni) Modified on 4/16/2024 to unseal document pursuant to Court Order, ECF 4 (jni) [1:24-mj-00368-WRP] Modified on 4/18/2024 (eta).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
3 3 2 pgs EX PARTE MOTION TO UNSEAL CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Shawn Pauahi Santana - by USA. (jni) [1:24-mj-00368-WRP]
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs ORDER UNSEALING CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Shawn Pauahi Santana re3 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/16/2024. (jni) [1:24-mj-00368-WRP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
5 5 6 pgs INDICTMENT as to Shawn Pauahi Santana (1) count(s) 1, 2-3, 4. (eta)
Related: [-]
8 8 EO: as to Shawn Pauahi Santana - An Initial Appearance; Arraignment to the Indictment is set for 5/10/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER) (jo)
Related: [-]