California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-01019
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2024
Terminated:Apr 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 12:20 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Steven Lee
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Niki Sue Harvey (1)
Terminated: 04/18/2024
Represented By
James Michael Chavez
Law Office Of James M. Chavez
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 12:29 AM PDT
Thursday, March 21, 2024
Arrest of Niki Sue Harvey (no document attached) (gac)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Niki Sue Harvey.(gac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Niki Sue Harvey: Initial Appearance set for 3/22/2024 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Initial Appearance as to Niki Sue Harvey held on 3/22/2024. Appointed Attorney James Michael Chavez(n/a) for Niki Sue Harvey. Bond set as to Niki Sue Harvey (1) $25,000 PS secured by 1 FRA and $2,500 cash deposit. Inpatient treatment/counseling ordered; Defendant to be released the following business day after bedspace is determined available. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 4/1/24 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Arraignment set for 4/18/24 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. ) (CD# 3/22/2024 DDL 24-1:2:15;3:08-3:09;3:10-3:19). (Plaintiff Attorney Henry Beshar AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Ryan DeLa Rosa FD-S/A, Brett Diehl FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
4 4 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Niki Sue Harvey (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Niki Sue Harvey (1) $25,000 PS secured by 1 FRA and $2,500 cash deposit. Inpatient treatment/counseling ordered; Defendant to be released the following business day after bedspace is determined available.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 3/22/2024. (cxl)
Related: [-]
8 8 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Niki Sue Harvey (cxl)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER as to Niki Sue Harvey: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 3/22/24. (aje)
Related: [-]