Gonsoulin v. Beta USA, Inc.
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Karen Wells Roby |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01005 |
Nature of Suit | 355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 3:04 AM CDT |
Defendant
Beta USA, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Michael Gonsoulin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/22 11:27 AM
Summons Issued as to Beta USA, Inc. (gla) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Summons Issued
Mon 04/22 10:19 AM
Request of Summons Issued as to Beta USA, Inc. filed by Joseph Michael Gonsoulin re1 Complaint. (Maberry, Andrew) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 04/22 9:57 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (kls) |
|
Sunday, April 21, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 04/21 9:13 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Joseph Michael Gonsoulin (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10495388) filed by Joseph Michael Gonsoulin.Attorney Callan Johns added to party Joseph Michael Gonsoulin(pty:pla).(Johns, Callan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit P-1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit P-2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit P-3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit P-4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit P-5 |