Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 6:24-mj-01412
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2024
Terminated:Apr 19, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 3:16 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Stephanie Alexa McNeff
Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Richard Guerra (1)
Terminated: 04/19/2024
Represented By
Joshua Roy Lukman
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 3:23 AM EDT
Friday, April 19, 2024
NOTICE to Middle District of Pennsylvania of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to Richard Guerra regarding your case number: 1:24-cr-101. Using your PACER account, you may retrieve the docket sheet and any documents via the case number link. No documents/record will be sent. If you require certified copies of any documents please send a request to InterdistrictTransfer_FLMD@flmd.uscourts.gov. If you wish the court to use a different email address in the future, please send a request to update your address to InterdistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov. (TNP)
Related: [-]
1 1 Arrest pursuant to Rule 5(c)(2) of Richard Guerra from the Middle District of Pennsylvania.(TNP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Middle District of Pennsylvania Indictment
2 2 Minute Entry for In Person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway: INITIAL APPEARANCE in Rule 5(c)(3) proceedings held on 4/19/2024 as to Richard Guerra from the Middle District of Pennsylvania. (Digital) (TNP)
Related: [-]
3 3 ***CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Richard Guerra. (TNP)
Related: [-]
4 4 Ore Tenus MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Richard Guerra. (TNP)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING THE FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER, granting 4 Ore Tenus Motion to Appoint Counsel as to Richard Guerra (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 4/19/2024. (TNP)
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings by Richard Guerra. (TNP)
Related: [-]
7 7 Ore Tenus MOTION for Release from Custody by USA as to Richard Guerra. (TNP)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release, granting 7 Ore Tenus Motion for Release from Custody. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 4/19/2024. (TNP)
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE of Standing Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act,[LINK:3:20-mc-20-TJC, Doc 1] as to Richard Guerra: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' disclosure obligation under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny and orders the United States to comply with that obligation. Violating this order may result in consequences, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, and other sanctions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. (TNP)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF REMOVAL pursuant to Rule 5(c)(3) to the Middle District of Pennsylvania as to Richard Guerra. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 4/19/2024. (TNP)
Related: [-]
11 11 RECEIPT for surrender of Passport as to Richard Guerra. Passport Number: A00743583. Issuing Country: United States of America. (TRF)
Related: [-]