Jonathan Gould v. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, et al
Original Case: 2:21-cv-04663
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01704 |
Type | civil / private / diversity |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 4:42 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JP MORGAN CHASE & CO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JONATHAN GOULD
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 4:42 AM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Jonathan Gould in District Court No. 2-21-cv-04663. (CJG) | ||
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court Order 03/18/24 | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (CJG) | ||
17 pgs Appendix Citation Notice sent to Steven J. Zweig, Esq., Tyler J. Kandel, Esq., Andrew W. Schwartz, Esq., Lauren Watson, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 05/03/2024. (CJG) |