Texas Chemistry Council v. EPA
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-ag-60193 |
Type | agency / petition for review |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 10:39 AM CDT |
Petitioner
Texas Chemistry Council
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
United States Environmental Protection Agency
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 10:39 AM CDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
AGENCY CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Texas Chemistry Council. Date received in 5th Circuit: 04/18/2024. Administrative Record due on 05/29/2024 24-60193 (WMJ) | ||
Att: 1 46 pgs Petition for Review | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs DKT-4 Letter |