Walter Allen v. EDUC
Original Case: 1:23-cv-03849
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cvus-05094 |
Type | civil us / united states |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 5:33 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
United States Department of Education
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Walter L. Allen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 5:33 AM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 24-5094 | ||
CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [2050496] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7021 0350 0001 8683 2291] of order [2050477-5], [2050474-5]. Certified Mail Receipt due 05/20/2024 from Walter L. Allen. 24-5094 | ||
5 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2050456] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:23-cv-03849-UNA filed by Walter L. Allen. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 24-5094 24-5094 | ||
1 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2050474] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 05/20/2024. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. 24-5094 | ||
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2050477] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/10/2024. APPENDIX due 06/10/2024. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. 24-5094 |