Spann v. Commissioner of Social Security
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | James S Moody, Jr |
Referred: | Sean P Flynn |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00961 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of substitution of AUSA
Mon 04/29 1:25 PM
Notice of substitution of AUSA. Ellen Veronica Abt substituting for Nadine DeLuca Elder. (Abt, Ellen) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/23 11:08 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/23/2024. (ACS) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/22 3:55 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:24-cv-961-JSM-SPF. Motion(s) REFERRED:2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. (TNP) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/22 10:53 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Yvette Spann. (Atkins, Sarah) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Mon 04/22 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Sarah Elizabeth Atkins on behalf of Yvette Spann. Lead Counsel: Sarah Atkins. (Atkins, Sarah) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/22 10:52 AM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Yvette Spann. (Atkins, Sarah) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/22 10:51 AM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Commissioner. The plaintiff declines consent to jurisdiction of the United States magistrate judge filed by Yvette Spann.(Atkins, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |