Ortiz v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William P Dimitrouleas |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-60654 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 11:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Maria Ortiz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 04/30 10:20 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Maria Ortiz. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company served on 4/26/2024, response/answer due 5/17/2024. (Macri, Jason) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Thu 04/25 11:09 AM
ORDER Requiring Counsel To Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report And Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/25/2024. See attached document for full details. (kpe) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/22 4:17 PM
Summons Issued as to United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (caw) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 04/22 4:14 PM
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (caw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/22 10:23 AM
COMPLAINT against United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17465507, filed by Maria Ortiz.(Macri, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |