New Jersey District Court
Judge:Leda D Wettre
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:24-cv-05395
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2024
Terminated:Nov 15, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 19, 2024 5:24 AM EDT
Defendant
QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED
Represented By
SUSAN L. NARDONE
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Notice Only
PHV ALBERT J. ASCIUTTO
Notice Only
PHV JASON J. THOMPSON
Plaintiff
RHONDA OXMAN
Represented By
JASON TRAVIS BROWN
Brown, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 13, 2025
37 37 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Fri 03/14 2:33 PM
ORDER granting35 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/13/2025. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
36 36 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 02/24 11:33 AM
CONSENT ORDER to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by RHONDA OXMAN, QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 2/19/2025. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/04 10:03 AM
Set Deadlines as to35 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval . Motion set for 3/3/2025 before Judge Michael E. Farbiarz. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
35 35 motion Settlement Mon 02/03 4:55 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval by QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED.(NARDONE, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Certification of Susan L. Nardone,
Att: 3 Certification of Jason J. Thompson,
Att: 4 Exhibit A (Settlement Agreement and Release),
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
34 34 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 01/16 9:42 AM
LETTER ORDER granting Defendant's33 Letter requesting an additional 30-day extension of the termination period to allow for the filing and approval of the necessary settlement papers. Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 1/14/2025. (wh)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Tue 01/14 9:37 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The33 Letter Request for Extension of Time filed by SUSAN L. NARDONE on 1/14/2025 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference, if filing a Letter Request that is not in the form of a Motion, please refer to the event "Letter". This message is for informational purposes only and the appropriate changes have been made by the Clerk's Office. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (wh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
33 33 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 01/13 12:45 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Settlement Documents by QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED. (NARDONE, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
32 32 notice Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case Mon 12/23 9:10 AM
Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney EDMUND CHARLES CELIESIUS terminated. (CELIESIUS, EDMUND)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
31 31 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/20 3:53 PM
NOTICE by RHONDA OXMAN Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Edmund C. Celiesius (CELIESIUS, EDMUND)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/11 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS RAYMOND CONLON on behalf of RHONDA OXMAN (CONLON, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Fri 11/15 12:41 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 1/14/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/15/2024. (wh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
28 28 misc Letter Thu 11/14 3:37 PM
Letter from Susan L. Nardone, Esq. re 26 Text Order,,, Set Hearings,,. (NARDONE, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/12 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by EDMUND CHARLES CELIESIUS on behalf of RHONDA OXMAN (CELIESIUS, EDMUND)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
26 26 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 10/29 4:59 PM
TEXT ORDER - A settlement conference is set for November 18, 2024 at 2:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre via Microsoft Teams. Log-in information will be circulated to local counsel of record, who are directed to appear at all proceedings along with counsel admitted pro hac vice. Clients with full and immediate settlement authority must attend for the duration. The parties may submit optional confidential settlement letters, which shall not exceed two (2) pages absent leave from the Court, to LDW_orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than November 14, 2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/29/2024. (rn)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 10/29 3:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 10/29/2024. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
25 25 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 10/21 4:37 PM
TEXT ORDER - A telephone conference is set for October 29, 2024 at 3:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Dial-in information for the conference is (973) 437-5535, access code 245 325 908#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/21/2024. (rn)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
24 24 misc Letter Fri 10/18 7:04 PM
Letter from Quest Diagnostics Incorporated to the Honorable Leda Dunn Wettre, U.S.M.J. re23 Order,. (NARDONE, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order Wed 10/02 3:18 PM
LETTER ORDER granting the parties' request to hold the pending motion in abeyance for an additional three weeks until 10/18/2024 and the parties will jointly update the Court via status letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/2/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
22 22 misc Letter Fri 09/27 4:01 PM
Letter from Susan L. Nardone, Esq. - Joint Status Letter. (NARDONE, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Wed 09/11 2:23 PM
LETTER ORDER that15 motion is held in abeyance for an additional 3 weeks through 9/27/20254. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/10/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
20 20 misc Letter Fri 09/06 7:12 PM
Letter from Quest Diagnostics Incorporated to the Honorable Leda Dunn Wettre, U.S.M.J. re 19 Text Order,. (NARDONE, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
19 19 order Text Order Mon 08/26 4:27 PM
TEXT ORDER - By letter dated July 29, 2024 (ECF18 ), the parties notified the Court that they intended to submit a proposed form of Order staying this action while they explore resolution. The parties are directed to file a status letter updating the Court about their efforts no later than September 6, 2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/26/2024. (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
18 18 misc Letter Mon 07/29 3:30 PM
Letter from Susan L. Nardone, Esq. re15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action . (NARDONE, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
17 17 respm Response to Motion Mon 07/22 1:12 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by RHONDA OXMAN re15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action (BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 07/03 10:52 AM
Set Deadlines as to15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action . Motion set for 8/5/2024 before Judge Michael E. Farbiarz. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Mon 07/01 11:17 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, JASON J. THOMPSON, ESQ., and ALBERT J. ASCIUTTO, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 06/28 5:11 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED identifying n/a as Corporate Parent.. (NARDONE, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Compel Arbitration Fri 06/28 5:00 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action by QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED.(NARDONE, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration of Michael Madden,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Michael Madden,
Att: 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Michael Madden,
Att: 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Michael Madden,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 7 Certificate of Service
Monday, June 24, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 06/24 4:11 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Albert J. Asciutto to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15467445.) (BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 06/24 4:10 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jason J. Thompson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15467434.) (BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/21 9:15 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ALBERT J. ASCIUTTO, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/21/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/21 9:12 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JASON J. THOMPSON, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/21/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/20 11:18 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Albert J. Asciutto by RHONDA OXMAN.(BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Albert J. Asciutto,
Att: 2 Certification of Jason T. Brown,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/20 11:07 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason J. Thompson by RHONDA OXMAN.(BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Jason J. Thompson,
Att: 2 Certification of Jason T. Brown,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/20 4:07 PM
Set Deadlines as to9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason J. Thompson ,10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Albert J. Asciutto . Motion set for 7/15/2024 before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/20 8:12 PM
Set Deadlines as to9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason J. Thompson . Motion set for 7/15/2024 before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order Tue 06/11 4:26 PM
CONSENT ORDER extending deadline for defendant to answer through 6/28/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/7/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
7 7 misc Proposed Order Thu 06/06 12:12 PM
Proposed Order Extending Deadline for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED. (NARDONE, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/31 1:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by RHONDA OXMAN. QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED served on 5/8/2024, answer due 5/29/2024. (BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Letter Fri 05/31 1:02 PM
Letter from Susan L. Nardone, Esq. re4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, Update Answer Due Deadline,.(NARDONE, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 05/31 4:18 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/12/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Thu 05/30 4:05 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order has been DENIED. The date of service in the application does not correspond with the date of service listed in the3 Summons Returned Executed. (pm, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
4 4 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 05/28 11:16 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Quest Diagnostics Incorporated. Attorney SUSAN L. NARDONE for QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED added. (NARDONE, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/25 4:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by RHONDA OXMAN. QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024. (BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 04/23 2:24 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
1 1 36 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/22 10:25 AM
COMPLAINT against QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15303264) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RHONDA OXMAN.(BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - DOL Fact Sheet #64,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff Oxman's consent form,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/22 11:19 AM
Judge Michael E. Farbiarz and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps)
Related: [-]