ARTS CLUB OF WASHINGTON, INC. v. ACE FIRE UNDERWRITERS INSURANE COMPANY
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Paul L Friedman |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01157 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 12:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
ACE FIRE UNDERWRITERS INSURANE COMPANY
|
|
Plaintiff
ARTS CLUB OF WASHINGTON, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 04/25 1:46 PM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ACE FIRE UNDERWRITERS INSURANE COMPANY.(znmw) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/25 1:44 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman. (znmw) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Tue 04/23 10:54 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ARTS CLUB OF WASHINGTON, INC. (Mitchell, Christopher) |
|
notice
Notice of Error- New Case
Tue 04/23 12:13 PM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint,. The following error(s) need correction: Attorney is not an Active bar member. Please refer to the court website for Bar Status Lookup, Attorney Admissions, and Renewal Information at www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorneys. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmw) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/22 12:02 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10841871) filed by ARTS CLUB OF WASHINGTON, INC..(Mitchell, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Summons |