Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:24-bk-10844
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Tremont Chicago, LLC
1024 Bayside Drive #383
Newport Beach, CA 92663
Represented By
Matthew E. McClintock
Goldstein & Mcclintock Lllp
contact info
Maria Aprile Sawczuk
Goldstein & Mcclintock Lllp
contact info
Amrit S. Kapai
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info
Ainsley G. Moloney
Goldstein & Mcclintock Lllp
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 25, 2025 10:27 AM EDT
Creditor
AMS Mechanical Systems, Inc.
Attn: Travis Eliason 130 E. Randolph St., Suite 3900
Chicago, IL 60601
Represented By
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Travis J. Eliason
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Creditor
Michael Alpert
Jeffrey Kurtzman,Esquire 101 N Washington Avenue Suite 4A
Margate, NJ 08402
Represented By
Jeffrey Kurtzman
Kurtzman Steady LLC
contact info
Creditor
Ronald Tarsy
Jeffrey Kurtzman,Esquire 101 N Washington Avenue Suite 4A
Margate, NJ 08402
Represented By
Jeffrey Kurtzman
Kurtzman Steady LLC
contact info
Creditor
Douglas Topkis
Jeffrey Kurtzman,Esquire 101 N Washington Avenue Suite 4A
Margate, NJ 08402
Represented By
Jeffrey Kurtzman
Kurtzman Steady LLC
contact info
Creditor Committee
OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
Represented By
James Richard Risener, III
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
James R. Risener, III
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
R. Stephen McNeill
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Christopher M. Samis
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Brett Michael Haywood
Potter Anderson & Corroon
contact info
Interested Party
LMREC IV NOTE HOLDER, INC.
Represented By
Curtis S. Miller
Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Scott Jones
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Hannah J McCollum
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
171 171 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 04/30 3:19 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Hearing Originally Scheduled for May 21, 2025 has been rescheduled. Filed by U.S. Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/22/2025 at 12:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (McCollum, Hannah)
Related: [-]