Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:24-bk-70073

Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Jeffery A Deller
Case #: 7:24-ap-07002
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2024
Terminated:Jun 11, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. d/b/a GM Financial
PO Box 183853
Arlington, TX 76096
Represented By
AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. d/b/a GM Financial
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher L Bratton
138 Curtin Street
Osceola Mills, PA 16666
Represented By
Kenneth P. Seitz
Law Offices Of Kenny P. Seitz
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
10 10 court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Tue 06/11 10:50 AM
Disposition of Adversary, Adversary Case 7:24-ap-7002 Closed. (dkam)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 26, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 05/27 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/26/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] :8 Order -Non-motion related-
Friday, May 24, 2024
8 8 3 pgs order Order -Non-motion related- Fri 05/24 10:36 AM
Order Approving Stipulation between AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial and Debtor. Signed on 5/24/2024. Related [+]. (mgut)
Related: [-] :7 Certification of Counsel Regarding
7 7 misc Certification of Counsel Regarding - PAWB Form 26 Fri 05/24 8:44 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Resolving Adversary Proceeding Filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. d/b/a GM Financial Related [+].(Craig, William)
Related: [-] :1 Complaint,4 Answer to Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, May 11, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 05/12 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] :5 Order Scheduling Trial/Pretrial
Thursday, May 09, 2024
5 5 order Scheduling Trial/Pretrial Thu 05/09 11:35 AM
Order Setting (A) Discovery Deadlines and Other Related Dates and (B) Evidentiary Hearing/Trial. Signed on 5/9/2024. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Statement due by 8/21/2024. Discovery due by 8/2/2024. Evidentiary Hearing/Trial set for 9/4/2024 at 10:30 AM at p04 Courtroom D, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. (mgut)
Related: [-] :1 Complaint,4 Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/08 10:10 AM
Answer to Complaint Regarding the Hearing on no hearing date scheduled. Filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. d/b/a GM Financial(Craig, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/23 9:53 AM
Summons Service Executed on AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. d/b/a GM Financial 4/23/2024 . (Seitz, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 04/22 12:27 PM
One Summons Issued on: AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. d/b/a GM Financial - Date Issued 4/22/2024, Answer Due 5/22/2024. If an answer is not timely filed, Plaintiff SHALL FILE a Motion For Default Judgment on or before 6/3/2024. cm: Kenneth P. Seitz, Esq. (skoz)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/22 8:47 AM
Adversary case 24-07002 Complaint Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §506(a) and Bankruptcy Rule 3012 to Determine the Value of Creditor's Allowed Secured Claim by Christopher L Bratton against AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. d/b/a GM Financial. Receipt Number NFR, Fee Amount $ 350. Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (Seitz, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order