Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Gretchen S Lund
Referred: John E Martin
Case #: 1:24-cv-00160
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2024
Terminated:Apr 26, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 04/09 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Tervarus L Gary from Elkhart County Jail to Westville Correctional Facility pursuant to new case 3:25-cv-296. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
9 9 misc Mail Returned Thu 05/23 2:51 PM
Mail Returned from Tervarus L Gary as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - Attempted Not Known re2 Order. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
8 8 motion Appeal In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/21 10:01 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Tervarus L Gary.(ash)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ledger,
Att: 2 Envelope
7 7 motion Appoint Counsel Tue 05/21 9:59 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Tervarus L Gary.(ash)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, May 13, 2024
6 6 misc Letter Tue 05/14 10:20 AM
Letter requesting help finding attorney from Tervarus L Gary. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
5 5 misc Letter Tue 05/14 9:59 AM
Letter regarding laywers contacted from Tervarus L Gary. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, May 03, 2024
4 4 misc Receipt Mon 05/06 8:13 AM
RECEIPT of (unsigned) Proposed Order from Tervarus L Gary.(mrm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
3 3 misc Letter Wed 05/01 12:16 PM
Letter regarding name spelling and advising he is looking for a professional lawyer from Tervarus Gary. (name spelling previously corrected) (mrm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, April 26, 2024
2 2 1 pgs order Order Terminate Civil Case Fri 04/26 3:23 PM
ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to close this case and open a new case with these filings in the South Bend Division, assigned to the same judges. New case number, 3:24-cv-340. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 04/26/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (jdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
1 1 6 pgs cmp Pro Se Complaint Mon 04/22 2:00 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against Elkhart County Sheriffs Department, Khan, Jeff Segal, filed by Tekuarus L Gary. (no filing fee or IFP received) Related [+](mrm)
Related: [-] turned file stamped copy with case number to Mr. Gary
Att: 1 Envelope