Anderson Jr. v. Secretary of Veterans Affairs et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | David S Leibowitz |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-60663 |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 4:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Director and Asst. Director Veteran Affairs
|
|
Defendant
Secretary of Veterans Affairs
|
|
Defendant
Veteran Hospital Doctors
|
|
Plaintiff
Norris Anderson Jr.
522400010 Broward County Jail-NBB NBB-A-1-114 North Broward Bureau Inmate Mail/Parcels Post Office Box 407037
Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33340 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party
Fri 05/03 9:45 AM
ORDER Dismissing1 Complaint (Without Prejudice) . Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 5/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Mon 04/22 4:11 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Norris Anderson Jr.. Responses due by 5/3/2024. (pc) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 04/22 4:06 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/22 3:59 PM
COMPLAINT against Director and Asst. Director Veteran Affairs, Secretary of Veterans Affairs, Veteran Hospital Doctors. Filing fees $ 405.00. (FEE NOT PAID) filed by Norris Anderson Jr..(pc) Modified text on 4/22/2024 (pc) |