Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Colville
Case #: 2:24-cv-00599
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2024
Terminated:Apr 24, 2025
Case in other court:Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, GD24-003157
Last checked: Saturday Oct 19, 2024 7:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Cleveland-Cliffs Monessen Coke LLC
345 Donner Avenue
Monessen, PA 15062
Represented By
Richard L. Etter
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Spenillo
Represented By
R. Andrew Santillo
Winebrake & Santillo, LLC
contact info
G. Timothy Conboy
Conboylaw, LLC
contact info
Peter Winebrake
Winebrake & Santillo, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
26 26 order Order of Consolidation (Docket on Member Case Only) Thu 04/24 11:56 AM
Order of Consolidation. This case is consolidated with 2:24-cv-286-RJC, the lead case. All pleadings, Motions and other papers hereafter filed shall be filed at 2:24-cv-286-RJC. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case closed Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/24/25. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
25 25 misc Stipulation Tue 04/22 3:28 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING THESE CASES WITH THE FIRST FILED PRYOR V. CLEVELAND-CLIFFS STEEL CORPORATION, 2:24-CV-00286-RJC (W.D. PA.) FOR PURPOSES OF SETTLEMENT (the parties respectfully ask the Court to sign the proposed stipulation) by Joseph Spenillo. (Santillo, R.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
24 24 order Order on Motion to Reassign Case Tue 02/04 2:57 PM
ORDER granting23 Joint MOTION to Reassign Case by Joseph Spenillo. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Colville for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 2/4/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Attorney Signature Deficient Tue 02/04 9:08 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re23 Motion to Reassign Case. ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information, BAR ID NUMBER. CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) in all future filings. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
23 23 motion Reassign Case Mon 02/03 4:06 PM
Joint MOTION to Reassign Case by Joseph Spenillo. (Santillo, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 17, 2025
22 22 minutes Telephonic Status Conference Fri 01/17 10:19 AM
A status conference was held on January 17, 2025. The parties confirmed that a settlement in principle has been reached in this matter and two other related actions, one before Judge Colville in this district, and another in the Eastern District of PA before Judge Brody. The parties will be seeking to consolidate all three actions before Judge Colville. The Court indicated that it will advise Judge Colville of the parties' position. (Court Reporter: none) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
21 21 misc Status Report Wed 01/15 4:43 PM
STATUS REPORT REGARDING MEDIATION by Joseph Spenillo. (Santillo, R.)
Related: [-]
20 20 adr Report of Mediation Wed 01/15 4:24 PM
REPORT of Mediation: Mediation held on 1/8/2025. Case has been resolved. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The online questionnaire can be accessed on [LINK:the court's website] . (Benson, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
19 19 order ~Util - Set Hearings Order Wed 12/18 12:10 PM
ORDER extending the stay until January 15, 2025. The parties shall file a joint status report by January 15, 2025 following the completion of their second mediation session. Telephonic Status Conference scheduled for January 17, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 12/18/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (emk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
18 18 misc Status Report Tue 12/17 11:23 AM
STATUS REPORT REGARDING MEDIATION by Joseph Spenillo. (Santillo, R.)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Attorney Signature Deficient Tue 12/17 12:21 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re18 Status Report. ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information (Pennsylvania or other state bar number). CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) in all future filings. This message is for informational purposes only. (kss)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
17 17 order Order Wed 10/30 8:24 AM
ORDER extending the stay until December 31, 2024. The parties shall attend a second mediation session that takes place in December. The parties shall file a joint status report within seven days of the completion of the second mediation session. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 10/30/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
16 16 misc Status Report Tue 10/29 6:35 PM
STATUS REPORT REGARDING MEDIATION by Joseph Spenillo. (Santillo, R.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
15 15 order Order Tue 09/17 9:24 AM
ORDER re14 STATUS REPORT - Joint - Pursuant to the Court's May 31, 2024 Order . The stay is extended until October 31, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 9/17/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
14 14 misc Status Report Mon 09/16 4:17 PM
STATUS REPORT - Joint - Pursuant to the Court's May 31, 2024 Order (Doc. 12) by Joseph Spenillo. (Santillo, R.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
13 13 misc Status Report Thu 06/06 3:28 PM
STATUS REPORT - Pursuant to the Courts May 31, 2024 Order (Doc. 12) by Joseph Spenillo. (Santillo, R.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 05/31 11:16 AM
ORDER granting11 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation. This matter is stayed and administratively closed until September 30, 2024. However, the parties shall file a Notice within seven (7) days of scheduling the mediation that provides the identity of the mediator and the date of the mediation. In the event that the mediation is rescheduled or continued, the parties shall file a Notice that provides an update of any other scheduled date or dates. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report within fourteen (14) days of the completion of the mediation.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/31/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
11 11 motion Stay Thu 05/30 11:14 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation by Cleveland-Cliffs Monessen Coke LLC. (Etter, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
10 10 respoth Response (other - do not select for response to motion) Tue 05/14 4:34 PM
RESPONSE to7 Status Report, filed by Cleveland-Cliffs Monessen Coke LLC. (Etter, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/07 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Winebrake on behalf of Joseph Spenillo. (Winebrake, Peter)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order Tue 05/07 10:14 AM
ORDER. No later than May 14, 2024, Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's status report7 by stating its position regarding whether this case is related to the action filed at 2:24-cv-286. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/7/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
7 7 misc Status Report Mon 05/06 2:54 PM
STATUS REPORT - Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel to Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge by Joseph Spenillo. (Santillo, R.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Wed 05/01 1:50 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by Joseph Spenillo. (Conboy, G.)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Wed 05/01 11:07 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re5 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying citizenship as required pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2). CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 5/8/2024. (jd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/30 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by G. Timothy Conboy on behalf of Joseph Spenillo. (Conboy, G.)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/30 9:02 AM
ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 4/30/2024. (mqe)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
3 3 misc Stipulation Mon 04/29 1:55 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Cleveland-Cliffs Monessen Coke LLC. (Etter, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Tue 04/23 8:59 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying Cleveland-Cliffs, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by Cleveland-Cliffs Monessen Coke LLC. (Etter, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
1 1 cmp ATTORNEY Notice of Removal (Credit Card Required) Mon 04/22 4:09 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD24-003157. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8227967), filed by Cleveland-Cliffs Monessen Coke LLC. (Etter, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit Pleading,
Att: 5 Exhibit Order,
Att: 6 Exhibit Docket,
Att: 7 Exhibit Notice of Filing NOR
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 04/23 9:18 AM
Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge added. (jd)
Related: [-]