HARLEM GLOBETROTTERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Reggie B Walton |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01164 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 5:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
ISABELLA CASILLAS GUZMAN
|
|
Defendant
U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION
|
|
Plaintiff
HARLEM GLOBETROTTERS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Wed 04/24 8:37 AM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Tue 04/23 4:48 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by HARLEM GLOBETROTTERS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by HARLEM GLOBETROTTERS INTERNATIONAL, INC..(Talati, Gunjan) |
|
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 04/23 12:43 PM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to ISABEL CASILLAS GUZMAN, U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION.(znmw) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/23 12:42 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (znmw) |
||
notice
Notice of Error- New Case
Tue 04/23 12:44 PM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint,. The following error(s) need correction: Missing summonses- U.S. government. When naming a U.S. government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (znmw) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Mon 04/22 5:17 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HARLEM GLOBETROTTERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Talati, Gunjan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/22 5:16 PM
COMPLAINT against ISABELLA CASILLAS GUZMAN, U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10843431) filed by HARLEM GLOBETROTTERS INTERNATIONAL, INC..(Talati, Gunjan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons U.S. Small Business Administration, | ||
Att: 3 Summons ISABEL CASILLAS GUZMAN, in her official capacity as Administrator |