Su v. TTM Incorporated
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Derrick K Watson |
Referred: | Kenneth J Mansfield |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00181 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 28:1331 Enforcement of Administrative Subpoena |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 11:13 AM HST |
Petitioner
Julie A. Su
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Toby Mannella
|
|
Respondent
TTM Incorporated
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, May 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Declaration
Thu 05/09 1:10 PM
Declaration re7 Response, 6 Link,, Declaration of Senior Trial Attorney Norman E. Garcia in Support of the Acting Secretarys Supplemental Briefing for Her Petition to Enforce an Administrative Subpoena and for Equitable Tolling . (Garcia, Norman) |
|
7 | 7
respm
Response
Thu 05/09 1:06 PM
RESPONSE re 6 Link,,1 PETITION to Enforce Administrative Subpoenas Duces Tecum Supplemental Briefing to the Acting Secretarys Petition to Enforce Administrative Subpoenas Duces Tecum Issued by the Wage and Hour Division of the United States Department of Labor and to Equitable Toll the Running of the FLSAs Statue of Limitations from August 24, 2023 filed by Julie A. Su. (Garcia, Norman) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
minutes
Link
Thu 05/02 3:29 PM
EO: The Court DIRECTS the Secretary to supplement her Petition with the following information: 1. Is the Secretary able to locate Toby Mannella? If yes, is the Secretary able to effect personal service upon Mr. Mannella? If not, what efforts has the Secretary made to locate Mr. Mannella? 2. Absent personal service, what authority does the Secretary rely upon for service "by certified and regular U.S. mail"? 3. Is there any basis for Alyssa Manila's acceptance of service for TTM and Manella beyond Ms. Manila's own statements on February 2, 2024? In particular, has Mr. Mannella authorized Ms. Manila's acceptance of service? IT IS SO ORDERED. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(kjm2) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
misc
Proposed Orders
Thu 04/25 9:25 AM
ADVISORY ENTRY . Submission of Proposed Orders - Please be advised that the (Proposed) Order to Show Cause, attached to1 Petition Enforce Administrative Subpoenas Duces Tecum, requires the court's approval. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in Microsoft Word format to the chambers of Chief Judge Derrick K. Watson at watson_orders@hid.uscourts.gov. The filing party may also review Section 10.4 of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of chambers' email addresses. (eta) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/22 10:55 AM
Notice to Parties Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Waiver of Service Packet
Mon 04/22 10:54 AM
CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.(eta) |
|
Att: 1 AO 398 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, | ||
Att: 2 AO 399 Waiver of the Service of Summons | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Rule 16
Mon 04/22 10:51 AM
Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 6/17/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/22/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 04/22 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00181 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings . (eta) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/22 9:21 AM
COMPLAINT (Petition to Enforce Administrative Subpoenas Duces Tecum Issued by the Wage and Hour Division of the United States Department of Labor and to Equitable Toll of the Running of the FLSA Statue of Limitations from August 24, 2023) against TTM Inc. dba Diamondhead Sprinklers, filed by Julie A. Su.(Garcia, Norman) Modified on 4/22/2024 (eta) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Acting Secretarys Petition to Enforce Administrative Subpoenas Duces Tecum Issued By the Wage and Hour Division of the United States Department of Labor and to Equitable Toll the Running of the FLSAs Statue of Limitations from August 24, 2023, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Wage And Hour Regional Administrator Ruben Rosalez in Support of the Acting Secretarys Petition to Enforce n Administrative Subpoena and for Equitable Tolling, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Wage and Hour Assistant District Director Min Kirk in Support of the Acting Secretarys Petition to Enforce an Administrative Subpoena and for Equitable Tolling, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Wage and Hour Investigator Noe Soltero in Support of the Acting Secretarys Petition to Enforce an Administrative Subpoena and for Equitable Tolling, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of Wage and Hour Technician Kevin Ingraham in Support of the Acting Secretarys Petition to Enforce an Administrative Subpoena and for Equitable Tolling, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration of Senior Trial Attorney Norman E. Garcia in Support of the Acting Secretarys Petition to Enforce an Administrative Subpoena and for Equitable Tolling, | ||
Att: 7 (Proposed) Order To Show Cause, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet |