Conti v. Bank of America
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Leslie E Kobayashi |
Referred: | Kenneth J Mansfield |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00182 |
Nature of Suit | 430 Other Statutes - Banks and Banking |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Second Circuit Court, 2CCV-24-0000071 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 11:13 AM HST |
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Bank of America, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vincent Conti
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, May 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
minutes
Link 2 - Set Hearings
Thu 05/09 1:43 PM
EO: In light of the7 Entering Order issued by District Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi, an Early Settlement Conference is set for 05/20/2024 at 11:00 a.m. by Video Tele-Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement conference statements are due by 05/13/2024.One double sided hard copy of the Settlement Conference Statements from each party shall be delivered to the Clerk's Office followed by an electronic version to be emailed to mansfield_orders@hid.uscourts.gov. The Courtroom Manager will be sending out a separate email providing counsel detailed instructions regarding Settlement Conferences Video Tele-Conference (VTC) access prior to the conference date. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF). Additionally, a courtesy email of this Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Tuesday, May 07, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
minutes
Link
Tue 05/07 8:14 AM
EO: COURT ORDER DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO MEET WITH THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR AN EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(nal) COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/29 1:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Allison Mizuo Lee appearing for Defendant Bank of America(Lee, Allison) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Allison Mizuo Lee, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/22 12:03 PM
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (jni) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Rule 16
Mon 04/22 12:01 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 6/3/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/22/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 4/22/2024. Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF). (jni) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 04/22 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00182 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings . COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 4/22/2024. Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF). (jni) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/22 11:24 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A..(Lee, Allison) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/22 10:54 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of America, N.A. from Second Circuit Court, case number 2CCV-24-0000071. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-2991714), filed by Bank of America, N.A..(Lee, Allison) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |