Berstler v. Pacheco
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Prose |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01091 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 5:09 PM MDT |
Defendant
Veronica Pacheco
|
|
Plaintiff
Christina Garcia Berstler
1535 North High Street
Denver, CO 80218 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/24 11:34 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No.2 ) is denied with leave to file as a completed form. By Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 4/23/2024. (schap, ) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Tue 04/23 9:21 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/23 9:20 AM
Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) by Plaintiff Christina Garcia Berstler. (efoga, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 9:20 AM
COMPLAINT against Veronica Pacheco, filed by Christina Garcia Berstler.(efoga, ) |