Lucero v. State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | N Reid Neureiter |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01092 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 5:10 PM MDT |
Defendant
State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Jeani Lucero
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Summons Issued
Wed 04/24 10:32 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (norlin, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Tue 04/23 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lia R. Rottman on behalf of Jeani LuceroAttorney Lia R. Rottman added to party Jeani Lucero(pty:pla) (Rottman, Lia) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Tue 04/23 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adam Leon Fonta on behalf of Jeani LuceroAttorney Adam Leon Fonta added to party Jeani Lucero(pty:pla) (Fonta, Adam) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/23 3:21 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against State Farm Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Jeani Lucero.(Zaner, Kurt) |
|
Att: 1 Summons to State Farm | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/22 4:09 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall promptly serve Defendant. On or before July 9, 2024, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #3), indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. Please note that this date may be earlier than the default deadlines contemplated by D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4). A Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.16(b) shall be held on: July 23, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (571) 353-2301, Access Code 841686937# . If this date is not convenient for any counsel/pro se party, he/she should confer with opposing counsel/pro se party and file a motion to reschedule the conference to a more convenient date. Absent exceptional circumstances, no request for rescheduling any appearance in this court will be entertained unless a motion is filed no less than FIVE (5) business days in advance of the date of appearance. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/22/2024. (norlin, ) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/22 4:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER On or before 5 p.m. on April 23, 2024, Plaintiff shall re-file the Complaint with redaction of all minor child names, and inclusion of those minors' initials, in accordance with Rule 5.2(a). The Civil Complaint and Jury Demand (Dkt. #1 ) contains the name a minor child. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a) requires that court filings that contain the name of an individual known to be a minor may include only the minor's initials. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to place Dkt. #1 under Level 1 Restriction. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/22/2024. (norlin, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Mon 04/22 3:41 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (efoga, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Mon 04/22 3:41 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/22 3:24 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against State Farm Automobile Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number BCODC-9649421)Attorney Kurt M. Zaner added to party Jeani Lucero, on behalf of minor(pty:pla), filed by Jeani Lucero, on behalf of minor.(Zaner, Kurt) |