Consolidated
Lead case: 1:24-cv-06795

Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Matthew F Kennelly
Case #: 1:24-cv-03223
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 19, 2024 4:30 AM CDT
Defendant
Aetna, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan Pitt
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Defendant
CIGNA Group
Represented By
Emilie Elizabeth O'toole
Mcdermott Will & Emery
contact info
Warren Haskel
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Joshua B. Simon
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Chelsea Edith Rae Cosillos
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Daniel Ray Campbell
Mcdermott Will & Emery
contact info
Dmitriy Tishyevich
Mcdermott Will & Emery
contact info
Defendant
Centene Corporation
Represented By
Arthur Burke
Davis, Polk & Wardwell
contact info
Sheila Adams
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Sheila R. Adams James
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Defendant
Elevance Health, Inc.
Represented By
E. Desmond Hogan
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Justin W. Bernick
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Edward Desmond Hogan
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Jordan Daniel Teti
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Health Care Service Corporation
Represented By
Brian Patrick Kavanaugh
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Scott David Stein
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kaiser Permanente LLC
Represented By
Jason C. Murray
Crowell & Moring
contact info
Defendant
MultiPlan, Inc.
Represented By
Craig Lewis Caesar
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Gary Feinerman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Represented By
Kristen C. Limarzi
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Henry H Cornillie
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Rachel Susan Brass
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Eric Y. Choi
Neal, Gerber & Eisenberg
contact info
Heather L Richardson
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Scott Jared Fisher
Neal, Gerber & Eisenberg
contact info
Joshua Lipton
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By
Jazmine Buckley
Crowell & Moring
contact info
Ashley Lydia McMahon
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Jordan Lee Ludwig
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Melissa Nguyen
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Jason Patrick Stiehl
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Jason C. Murray
Crowell & Moring
contact info
Movant
Nassau Medical Practice, P.C.
Movant
Manhattan Medical Practice, P.C.
Movant
Anesthesia Care P.C.
Movant
Live Well Chiropractic PLLC
Movant
Ivy Creek of Tallapoosa LLC
Plaintiff
Allegiance Health Management, Inc.
Represented By
Quinn Burns
Burns Charest
contact info
James Charles Pullos
Clifford Law Offices, P.C.
contact info
Natalie Rose Earles
Burns Charest LLP
contact info
Korey Arthur Nelson
Burns Charest LLP
contact info
Robert A. Clifford
Clifford Law Offices, P.C.
contact info
Kristofer S. Riddle
Clifford Law Offices, P.C.
contact info
Warren Tavares Burns
Burns Charest LLP
contact info
Christopher Cormier
Burns Charest LLP
contact info
Matthew S. Tripolitsiotis
Burns Charest LLP
contact info
Shannon Marie McNulty
Clifford Law Offices
contact info
Amanda Kate Klevorn
Burns Charest LLP
contact info
Matthew R. Strauser
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Humana, Inc.
Terminated: 07/23/2024
Represented By
Daniel P. Culley
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Benjamin E. Waldin
Eimer Stahl LLP
contact info
Vanessa G. Jacobsen
Eimer Stahl LLP
contact info
John K. Adams
Eimer Stahl LLP
contact info
Heather Nyong'o
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Scott C. Solberg
Eimer Stahl LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/11/2025 6:00 PM CDT
Monday, April 22, 2024
1 1 85 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Allegiance Health Management, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21883583.(McNulty, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Allegiance Health Management, Inc. by Shannon Marie McNulty (McNulty, Shannon)
Related: [-]