Toussiant v. O' Malley
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jill L Burkhardt |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00719 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:0405rs Review of HHS Decision (RSI) |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (GO 707)
Tue 04/30 12:39 PM
Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, Pursuant to General Order 707, by Rudy Toussaint.(rxc) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/24 12:33 PM
ORDER Re Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis: Granting2 Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 4/24/24. (exs) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Social Security Case Assignment
Mon 04/22 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Jill L. Burkhardt has been randomly assigned. Plaintiff and plaintiff's counsel are hereby notified of plaintiff's right to consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Provided, as an attachment to this notice, is a consent/declination form for plaintiff to complete. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this notice. The Notice of Electronic Filing of the complaint sent by the court to the Commissioner suffices for service of the complaint. The Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4. (axc1) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Mon 04/22 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Rudy Toussiant. No Parties With Financial Interest. (axc1) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/22 4:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rudy Toussiant. (axc1) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/22 4:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Martin O' Malley, IFP Filed, filed by Rudy Toussiant. The new case number is 3:24-cv-719-JLB. Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt is assigned to the case. (Perales, Monica)(axc1) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |