California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:René Lastreto II
Case #: 1:24-bk-11016
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Tyco Group
764 P St Ste 105
Fresno, CA 93721-2745
Represented By
Michael Jay Berger
contact info
Debtor
Tyco Group LLC
764 P St Ste 105
Fresno, CA 93721-2745
Represented By
Michael Jay Berger
contact info
Last checked: Monday May 13, 2024 12:32 PM PDT
Creditor
Tiffany Carroll
Office of the United States Trustee Attn: Michael J. Fletcher 2500 Tulare Street, Suite 1401
Fresno, CA 93721
Represented By
Michael J. Fletcher
Doj-Ust
contact info
Creditor
Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.
Venable LLP 100 Southeast Second St #4400
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Hagop T. Bedoyan
contact info
Stockholder
Imran Damani
764 P St. Ste 105
Fresno, CA 93721
Trustee
Walter R. Dahl
Dahl Law 8757 Auburn Folsom Rd #2820
Granite Bay, CA 95746
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
United States Courthouse 2500 Tulare Street, Room 1401
Fresno, CA 93721
U.S. Trustee
Tiffany Carroll
Office of the United States Trustee Attn: Deanna K. Hazelton 2500 Tulare St #1401
Fresno, CA 93721
Represented By
Deanna K. Hazelton
Doj-Ust
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
U.S. Trustee
Tracy Hope Davis
Terminated: 04/24/2024
Office of the United States Trustee Attn: Deanna K. Hazelton 2500 Tulare St #1401
Fresno, CA 93721
Represented By
Deanna K. Hazelton
Doj-Ust
contact info

GPO Mar 27 2025
Memorandum Opinion/Decision Re: 300 Motion/Application to Remove the Debtor from Possession and Expand the Powers of the Subchapter V Trustee [MB-4] ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. (ltrf)
GPO Mar 27 2025
Memorandum Opinion/Decision Re: 286 Motion/Application to Remove Debtor From Possession and Expand the Powers of the Subchapter V Trustee [VP-2] (ltrf)
GPO Apr 04 2025
Memorandum Opinion/Decision Re: 327 Motion/Application for Compensation [MJB-13] for Michael Jay Berger, Debtors Attorney(s). Filed by Michael Jay Berger ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. (ltrf)

Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 5:00 PM PDT
Monday, April 22, 2024
misc EFILED RECEIPT - Voluntary Petition Fee Paid (11) [ADI] Mon 04/22 5:51 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee Paid: $1,738.00, Receipt Number: 389376, eFilingID: 7343031) (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 36 pgs misc Voluntary Petition 11 - Case Upload Mon 04/22 5:42 PM
Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party. See page 36 of the Voluntary Petition (tsef)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Master Address List Mon 04/22 5:46 PM
Master Address List (auto)
Related: [-]
5 5 related Support Document Tue 04/23 1:02 PM
Support Document/Resolution Authorizing the Filing of a Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Petition Re:1 Voluntary Petition Filed by Debtor Tyco Group LLC (ltrf)
Related: [-]