California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jennifer E Niemann
Case #: 1:24-bk-11017
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
California QSR Management, Inc.
764 P St Ste 105
Fresno, CA 93721-2745
Represented By
Michael Jay Berger
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
United States Courthouse 2500 Tulare Street, Room 1401
Fresno, CA 93721

GPO Mar 27 2025
Memorandum Opinion/Decision Re: 269 Motion/Application to Remove the Debtor from Possession and Expand the Powers of the Subchapter V Trustee [MB-4] ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. (ltrf)
GPO Mar 27 2025
Memorandum Opinion/Decision Re: 259 Motion/Application to Remove Debtor From Possession and Expand the Powers of the Subchapter V Trustee [VP-2] (ltrf)
GPO Apr 04 2025
Memorandum Opinion/Decision Re: 294 Motion/Application for Compensation [MJB-12] for Michael Jay Berger, Debtors Attorney(s). Filed by Michael Jay Berger ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. (ltrf)

Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 5:00 PM PDT
Monday, April 22, 2024
misc EFILED RECEIPT - Voluntary Petition Fee Paid (11) [ADI] Mon 04/22 6:36 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee Paid: $1,738.00, Receipt Number: 389379, eFilingID: 7343048) (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 50 pgs misc Voluntary Petition 11 - Case Upload Mon 04/22 6:27 PM
Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party (tjof)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Master Address List Mon 04/22 6:32 PM
Master Address List (auto)
Related: [-]
4 4 related Support Document Tue 04/23 1:03 PM
Support Document/Resolution Authorizing the Filing of a Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Petition Re:1 Voluntary Petition Filed by Debtor California QSR Management, Inc. (ltrf)
Related: [-]