Vance v. GDS Publishing, Inc.
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | James Lawrence King |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21528 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 12:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
GDS Publishing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Vance
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
answer
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Fri 05/03 5:12 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by GDS Publishing, Inc.. (Zelmanowitz, Andrew) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Mon 04/29 12:27 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. The time to file a response/answer is extended to 5/3/2024. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 4/29/2024. See attached document for full details. (jp00) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 04/26 12:38 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by GDS Publishing, Inc..(Zelmanowitz, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time | ||
3 | 3
discov
Notice of Filing Discovery
Fri 04/26 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Filing Discovery: Notice of Serving Discovery Requests by William Vance.(OBeidy, A.) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 04/23 9:17 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint)
Mon 04/22 7:18 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17468588, filed by GDS Publishing, Inc..(Zelmanowitz, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "A" State Court Filings, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit "B" New York Department of State Entity Information, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit "C" Demand Letter |