Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Beth Bloom
Referred: Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein
Case #: 1:24-cv-21529
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2024
Terminated:Jun 05, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 19, 2024 7:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Humza Khan
Represented By
Patrick Michael Muldowney
Baker & Hostetler
contact info
Defendant
Mattie Kyriakou
Represented By
Patrick Michael Muldowney
Baker & Hostetler
contact info
Plaintiff
InterEx Inc.
Represented By
Lauren A. Herz-DerKrikorian
Squire Patton Boggs (us), LLP
contact info
Andrew Russell Kruppa
Squire Patton Boggs (us) LLP
contact info
Jill S Kirila
Squire Patton Boggs (us) LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago
Friday, February 21, 2025
34 34 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Fri 02/21 10:55 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/20/2025. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
33 33 misc Stipulation Thu 02/20 5:00 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice by InterEx Inc. (Kruppa, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
32 32 order Amended Order ~Util - Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) sent Wed 12/11 1:10 PM
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S30 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR DISCHARGE AND RELEASE OF INJUNCTION BOND, Additional Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) sent to Financial Clerk. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/11/2024. See attached document for full details. (cds)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Release of Funds Tue 10/22 12:37 PM
ORDER granting30 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR DISCHARGE AND RELEASE OF INJUNCTION BOND Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Release of Funds Tue 10/22 10:35 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Release of Funds Motion for Discharge and Release of Injunction Bond by InterEx Inc..(Kruppa, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
29 29 order Preliminary Injunction Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 06/05 3:29 PM
ORDER ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: The above-styled action is administratively CLOSED without prejudice to the parties. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE this case for administrative purposes only. Closing Case. (Without Prejudice) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
28 28 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 06/03 1:05 PM
ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES Signed by Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein on 6/3/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
27 27 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 06/03 1:04 PM
ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE, ( Status Report due by 10/21/2024., Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 10/28/2024 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein on 6/3/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 06/03 9:39 AM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRINGMEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/28/2024., Discovery due by 12/10/2024., Expert Discovery due by 12/10/2024., Mediation Deadline 12/24/2024., In Limine Motions due by 3/24/2025., Dispositive Motions due by 1/1/2025., Motions due by 1/1/2025., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/24/2025., Jury Trial set for 4/7/2025 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 4/1/2025 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 12/24/2024.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/29/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
25 25 5 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/24 2:34 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Humza Khan, Mattie Kyriakou. (Muldowney, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
24 24 minutes Miscellaneous Hearing Thu 05/16 10:56 AM
PAPERLESS MINUTE ENTRY FOR MAY 13, 2024 HEARING: Minutes for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom in Wilkie D. Ferguson Courthouse 10-2, held on 5/13/2024 at 9:00am. Parties agree to extend the TRO entered by the Court in ECF No. 10 by fourteen days, pending the Court's approval of parties' proposed preliminary injunction order. Parties shall submit to the Court a proposed preliminary injunction order via CM/ECF, and should also email a Word document of the proposed order to the Court at Bloom@flsd.uscourts.gov. Parties agree to refer the case to arbitration and stay the case. Total time in court: 1 hour. Attorney Appearance(s): Lauren A. Herz-DerKrikorian and Andrew Russell Kruppa appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Patrick Michael Muldowney appeared on behalf of Defendants. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (hby)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
23 23 4 pgs trial Exhibit and Witness List Fri 05/10 11:42 AM
Exhibit and Witness List by InterEx Inc... (Kruppa, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
22 22 misc Clerk's Receipt (combines Filing Fee and Partial Filing Fee) Thu 05/09 4:52 PM
Clerks Receipt for deposit into the registry per order of the court (DE#10) received on 5/9/2024 in the amount of $ 10,000.00, receipt number FLS286550. (vt)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Thu 05/09 3:11 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Remotely at the Hearing, ECF No.18 . Plaintiff's witnesses can appear remotely via the Zoom link provided in ECF No. 15 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (hby)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/09 3:07 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Lauren A. Herz-DerKrikorian, ECF No.19 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (hby)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Thu 05/09 2:22 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Lauren A. Herz-DerKrikorian. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17516642 by InterEx Inc.. Responses due by 5/23/2024.(Kruppa, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order
18 18 motion Appear Thu 05/09 12:53 PM
Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Remotely at the Hearing on May 13, 2024 by InterEx Inc..(Kruppa, Andrew) Modified Relief on 5/9/2024 (ls)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
17 17 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/09 10:34 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot16 Motion to Authorize Alternative Service Under Rule 4(F)(3). Counsel for Defendants has appeared in this action and Defendants are authorized to appear remotely. See ECF Nos. [13-15]. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/07 7:43 PM
MOTION Motion to Authorize Alternative Service Under Rule 4(F)(3) re 12 Order,, by InterEx Inc..(Kruppa, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 19 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 91 pgs Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 7 pgs Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order
Monday, May 06, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/06 6:25 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendants' Motion to Appear Remotely at May 13, 2024 9:00am Hearing, ECF No.13 . The Court's Zoom information is as follows: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/16191705654?pwd=WmlmK0RpelQ5bUZhdTVGM3RUMHZoUT09 Meeting ID: 161 9170 5654 Passcode: 692150 Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (hby)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/06 6:10 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates by Humza Khan, Mattie Kyriakou (Muldowney, Patrick)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/06 6:02 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Appear Remotely at Hearing on May 13, 2024 re10 Order on Motion to Expedite, by Humza Khan, Mattie Kyriakou. Attorney Patrick Michael Muldowney added to party Humza Khan(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick Michael Muldowney added to party Mattie Kyriakou(pty:dft). (Muldowney, Patrick)
Related: [-]
12 12 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 05/06 2:51 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 4(f): On May 3, 2024, Plaintiff filed a Certificate of Service, ECF No.11 , pursuant to the Court's Order to serve Defendants prior to the Court's Preliminary Injunction hearing on May 13, 2024, ECF No.10 . In its Certificate of Service, Plaintiff states it has served Defendants by email and on LinkedIn but failed to serve them in person. ECF No.11 . Plaintiff is directed to file proof that service complies with Rule 4(f) for service of an individual in a foreign country, or alternately must move for an order authorizing alternative service of process under Rule 4(f)(3) on or before May 7, 2024 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (hby)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
11 11 service Certificate of Service Fri 05/03 3:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by InterEx Inc. re10 Order on Motion to Expedite,(Kruppa, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
10 10 17 pgs order Order on Motion to Expedite Tue 04/30 2:57 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part9 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Show Cause Hearing set for 5/13/2024 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/30/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
9 9 motion Expedite Mon 04/29 4:19 PM
MOTION to Expedite Resubmitted Expedited Motion Pursuant to L.R. 7.1(D)(2) and Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by InterEx Inc.. (Kruppa, Andrew)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Compliance Mon 04/29 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Compliance Rule 65(b)(1)(B) Certification of Cousnel by InterEx Inc. re 7 Order on Expedited Motion,, (Kruppa, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 41 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1
Friday, April 26, 2024
7 7 order Order on Expedited Motion Fri 04/26 5:36 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying Plaintiff's Expedited Motion for A Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, ECF No.3 , without prejudice for failing to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b)(1)(B)'s requirement that "the movant's attorney certifies in writing any efforts made to give notice and the reasons why it should not be required" necessary for the court to "issue a temporary restraining order without written or oral notice to the adverse party or its attorney." Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (hby)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
6 6 6 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Wed 04/24 7:07 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/23/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/23 1:54 PM
Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by InterEx Inc. identifying Corporate Parent InterEx Limited, Other Affiliate InterEx Recruitment Group Ltd. for InterEx Inc. (Kruppa, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/23 1:48 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Ami Noble-Newton in Support by InterEx Inc. re3 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION For Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support (Kruppa, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 10 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 14 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 4 14 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 5 17 pgs Exhibit E
3 3 motion Expedited Motion Tue 04/23 1:42 PM
Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION For Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support by InterEx Inc..(Kruppa, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, April 22, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 04/23 9:38 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/22 10:02 PM
COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against Humza Khan, Mattie Kyriakou. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17468706, filed by InterEx Inc..(Kruppa, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet