Bank of New York Mellon v. Gutierrez et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Donald M Middlebrooks |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80500 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 12:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Capital One Bank (USA) N.A
1111 e main st 16th floor
richmond, VA 23219 |
|
Defendant
First Banc Mortgage, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Maria C. Gutierrez
|
|
Defendant
Danyil Holosenko
|
|
Defendant
Roman Moskalenko
|
|
Defendant
Palm Beach County Clerk of Court & Comptroller
|
|
Defendant
Presidential Way Association, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Presidential Way, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Terano Financial
|
|
Defendant
The Lands of The President Condominium Two, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Zhezheria Valentyn
|
|
Plaintiff
Bank of New York Mellon
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/24 3:20 PM
NOTICE by Presidential Way, LLC re 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, (Bryl, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit State court docket, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit State court records, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit State court records, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit State court records, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit State court records, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit State court records, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit State court records | ||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Remand to State Court
Tue 04/23 4:43 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bank of New York Mellon.(Levine, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (State Court Complaint), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B (State Court Appearance), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C (State Court Answer), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D (State Court Motion for SummaryJudgment of Foreclosure), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E (State Court Order Setting Hearing) | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/23 4:27 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of New York Mellon identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for Bank of New York Mellon (Levine, Eric) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 04/23 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Marc Levine on behalf of Bank of New York Mellon (Levine, Eric) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions
Tue 04/23 1:22 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Michael D. Stewart has not been added to this case re1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), due to his membership status in this Courts Bar[LINK:https://www.flsd.uscourts.gov/flsd-bar-admission-status-and-admission-date-look] . (pt) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Bar Letter
Tue 04/23 1:15 PM
Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Erick P. Steffens, mailing date April 23, 2024, (pt) |
|
3 | 3
order
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Tue 04/23 10:26 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. State Court Records not legible and the Complaint was not included. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the State Court Records including State Court Complaint attached within 24 hours. (pc) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 04/23 10:23 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint)
Mon 04/22 9:30 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON v. GUTIERREZ) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17468677, filed by Presidential Way, LLC.(Bryl, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit pending motions and other state court documents, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet JS44 |