Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Reggie B Walton |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01166 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 12:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
11
pgs
misc
Memorandum
Thu 05/02 10:36 AM
MEMORANDUM re4 MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC..(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Stalzer, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Williamson, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration Paige | ||
4 | 4
motion
Discovery
Thu 05/02 10:33 AM
MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC..(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/23 12:33 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (znmw) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Report Regarding Copyright
Mon 04/22 7:25 PM
REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright..(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
2 | 2
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Mon 04/22 7:23 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (James, Jacqueline) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/22 7:22 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10843728) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet |