Williams v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Julie S Sneed |
Referred: | Robert M Norway |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00745 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 12:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sebrena Williams
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Thu 05/02 5:19 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. Related case(s): Yes (Turci, Amy) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 05/02 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Amy R. Turci on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. Lead Counsel: Amy R. Turci. (Turci, Amy) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Mon 04/29 5:09 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Underkofler, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
15
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/25 8:20 AM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 4/25/2024. (GNB) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/23 2:00 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Sebrena Williams. (Chanfrau, Kelly) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Tue 04/23 1:56 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Sebrena Williams. Related case(s): Yes (Chanfrau, Kelly) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 04/23 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kelly Hagan Chanfrau on behalf of Sebrena Williams. Lead Counsel: Kelly H. Chanfrau. (Chanfrau, Kelly) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 04/23 9:10 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/23 9:10 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Julie S. Sneed and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-745-JSS-RMN. (AJS) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/22 6:41 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seventh Judicial Circuit, Volusia County, FL, case number 2024 10354 CIDL filed in State Court on 01/26/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22010113 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(Underkofler, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet Exhibit B - State Court Docket, | ||
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents Exhibit C - State Court Other Documents, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Notice of Removed Action, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |