Jones v. Jones
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Steven D Merryday |
Referred: | Natalie Hirt Adams |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00931 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 12:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Titus L. Jones
91 Hibiscus
Winter Haven, FL 33881 |
|
Plaintiff
Sueanna G. Jones
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Supplement
Mon 04/29 12:47 PM
SUPPLEMENT re1 Notice of Removal by Sueanna G. Jones.(CTR) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Remand to State Court
Fri 04/26 3:31 PM
First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Sueanna G. Jones.(Jackson Sanders, Charlann) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Appendix ONE, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix Appendix TWO | ||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/24 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Filing State Court Documents by Titus L. Jones re1 Notice of Removal(AA) |
|
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT | ||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/22 11:18 AM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 10th Judicial Circuit, case number 53-2021-DR-006189-0000 00 Filing fee $405.00, receipt number TPA70306 filed by Titus L. Jones.(No state court documents provided.)(MCB) |