Moore II v. United Medical Credit, Inc.
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah E Geraghty |
Referred: | Catherine M Salinas |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01687 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 12:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
United Medical Credit, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Joseph E. Moore II
2274 Salem Rd SE #106-1006
Conyers, GA 30013 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing Forms Sent
Thu 04/25 8:41 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Joseph E. Moore II re2 Order. Forms sent to party: USM 285; Summons; Initial Disclosures. (ane) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/25 8:39 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Joseph E. Moore II.(ane) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
4
pgs
order
Order ruling on IFP ~Util - Allowing Case to Proceed ~Util - Directing Service by Clerk
Thu 04/25 8:36 AM
ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis and allowing case to proceed without prepayment of costs or service fees. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff the USM 285 form, summons, and the initial disclosures form. Plaintiff is directed to complete service forms and return to Clerk within 20 days from the entry date of this Order. Upon receipt of forms, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare a service waiver package for each Defendant. In the event a Defendant does not return the Waiver of Service form to the Clerk of Court within Thirty-five(35) days following the date the service waiver package was mailed, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare and transmit to the U.S. Marshal's Service a service package for each Defendant who failed to return the waiver form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 4/24/2024. (ane) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/22 10:44 AM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (gww) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/22 10:43 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph E. Moore II.(gww) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |