Morris v. Vanuto et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Leigh Martin May |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01692 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 12:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
Laura Arnold
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jackie Vanuto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Morris
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Fri 04/26 2:49 PM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc..(Martin, Sean) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Fri 04/26 2:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Laura Arnold.(Martin, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Laura Arnold's Motion to Dismiss | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Fri 04/26 2:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Jackie Vanuto.(Martin, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Jackie Vanuto's Motion to Dismiss | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
30+
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/22 12:01 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/22/2024. (bnp) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/22 10:53 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Martin, Sean) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Mon 04/22 10:42 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Laura Arnold. (Filed 04/11/2024 in Sate Court and included with Notice of Removal)(bmr) |
|
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Mon 04/22 10:40 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jackie Vanuto. Discovery ends on 9/16/2024. (Filed 04/10/2024 in Sate Court and included with Notice of Removal)(bmr) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/22 10:35 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13376854)(bmr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings and Orders, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |